Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80515-COA
Short Caption:PREFERRED TR. CO. LLC FBO WILLIAM R. TURNER TRADITIONAL IRA VS. BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80515
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A714941Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-12308
05/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: June 1, 2021. (COA)21-13873
05/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Lilith V. Xara of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent). (COA)21-15210
05/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Rex D. Garner and Jamie K. Combs are no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (COA)21-15217
06/01/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-15587
06/01/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Joseph Y. Hong. (COA)
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-21000
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)