Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82127-COA
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A819712
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-11748
05/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-13327
05/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (COA)21-13930
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-17288
06/30/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/30/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)