Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82605
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO A.S.S., W.M.S.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J348958Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/10/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Mother) (SC)
03/10/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant Mother) (SEALED) (SC)
03/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Mother) (SC)
03/26/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Father) (SC)
03/26/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Appellant Father) (SEALED) (SC)
03/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Father) (SC)
04/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, neither appellant has paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notices. Accordingly, "their appeals are dismissed." (SC)21-10774
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13293
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13293