Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82617
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. THE EIGHTH JUD. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82710, 82710-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813134Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition. (SC)
03/11/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-07190
03/11/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Waive Filing Fees for Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-07191
03/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner is seeking a waiver of the filing fee for this original proceeding, asserting indigence and inability to pay it. The motion is denied without prejudice because it is not accompanied by an affidavit of the petitioner that demonstrates petitioner's inability to pay the filing fee. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this order to renew the motion and provide an affidavit that substantially complies with NRAP Form 4. Alternatively, petitioner shall, within the same time period, pay the filing fee. (SC)21-07803
04/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. To date, petitioner has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's order. Accordingly, "this petition is dismissed." (SC)21-09981
04/08/2021Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Document Regarding Case. (SC)21-10133
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 8, 2021, Bonham filed an affidavit in support of his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The affidavit is construed as a motion for reconsideration of the April 7, 2021, order dismissing this petition. The motion for reconsideration is denied. (SC)21-10855
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-12573
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)