Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82622
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF STEVEN T. LOIZZICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
03/15/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1-2. (SC).21-07380
03/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-07382
04/19/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
05/06/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. We hereby suspend attorney Steven T. Loizzi from the practice in law in Nevada for 135 days , commencing from the date of this order. Loizzi must pay $2,500 in administrative costs pursuant to SCR 120 and the actual cost of the disciplinary proceeding within 30 days from the date of this order. The parties shall comply with SCR 115 and SCR 121.1 EN BANC (SC)21-12992
05/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts. (SC)21-13645
05/17/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Compliance with Supreme Court Rule 115. (SC)21-14214
06/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15667
06/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on June 7, 2021. (SC)21-15667