Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80098-COA
Short Caption:63 MEGAN TR. VS. MORTG. ELEC. REGISTRATION SYS.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):70629, 80098
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A705722Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-12311
05/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: June 1, 2021. (COA)21-13874
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)