Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80470-COA
Short Caption:PERROTTA VS. KEYZERS C/W 81174Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:80470-COA*, 81174-COARelated Case(s):80470, 81174, 81174-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700587Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. Nos. 80470/81174. (COA).
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing (Docket No. 80470-COA), Vacating (Docket No. 81174-COA), and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court REVERSED (Docket No. 80470-COA), VACATED (Docket No. 81174-COA), AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. Nos. 80470/81174. (COA)21-17384
07/06/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 80470/81174. (COA)21-19343
07/06/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Kirk C. Johnson. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)
08/18/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)21-24161
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)