Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81174-COA & 81174
Short Caption:PERROTTA VS. KEYZERS C/W 80470Court:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Consolidated:80470-COA*, 81174-COARelated Case(s):80470, 80470-COA, 81174
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700587Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-18234
05/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-18237
05/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kaempfer Crowell. Check no. 0282. (SC)
05/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-18819
05/19/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Debbie Leonard. (SC)20-18986
05/21/2020Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
05/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC)20-19398
05/26/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Robertson Law Firm. Check no. 28221. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
06/04/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-21065
06/05/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 17, 2020, at 9:00 AM. Case Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)20-21256
06/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-21398
06/15/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. After further discussions with counsel, it was determined that this case is not appropriate for mediation. The June 17, 2020 mediation is vacated. Case Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)20-22277
06/18/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Cross-Appeal, Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants/cross-respondents (appellants) and respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) shall each have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of respondent's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellants' combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)20-22815
06/26/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/15/19 To Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs. Nos 80470/81174. (SC)20-23780
06/26/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Docketing Statement. Nos 80470/81174 (SC)20-23799
07/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/15/19. Nos 80470/81174 (SC)20-25083
09/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for this Court to Direct the District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibits Pursuant to NRAP 30(d) Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-33659
09/16/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34168
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34169
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34171
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 3 (PAGE 675 FILED UNDER SEAL PER 12/3/20 ORDER). Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34172
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 4 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34173
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 5 (Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34174
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 6 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34175
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 7 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34176
09/16/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 8 Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34177
09/17/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion Non-Opposition for This Court to Direct the District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibits. Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-34206
09/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-Appellant's unopposed motion requesting that this court direct the district court clerk to transmit original exhibits is granted. Exhibit 7 due: 14 days. Nos 80470/81174. (SC)20-35753
10/08/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent in docket No. 80470 and respondent/cross-appellant in docket No. 81174 shall have until November 2, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)20-36995
11/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief/ Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)20-39926
11/16/2020MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Mark Keyzers's Motion to Modify and Correct the Record on Appeal. (EXHIBIT 1 DETATCHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 12/3/20 ORDER). Nos. 80470/81174. (SC).20-41716
11/18/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Non-Opposition to Motion to Modify and Correct the Record on Appeal. Nos 80470/81174. (SC)20-42206
11/19/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Briefs. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC).20-42400
12/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Approving Stipulation. The motion filed on November 16, 2020, is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach and file separately the redacted portion of the joint appendix attached as exhibit 1 to the motion filed on November 16, 2020. Additionally, the clerk of this court shall file the unredacted document, located in volume 3 of the joint appendix at page 675, under seal. The parties' stipulation filed on November 19, 2020, is approved. Reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: December 16, 2020. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until January 13, 2021, to filed and serve the reply brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)20-43863
12/03/2020AppendixFiled Redacted portion of the joint appendix exhibit 1. (FILED PER 12/3/20 ORDER). Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-43869
12/03/2020AppendixFiled Page 675 of appendix volume 3 (SEALED). Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)
12/16/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)20-45636
01/14/2021BriefFiled Respondent Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. (REJECTED PER 1/15/21 NOTICE). (SC)
01/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document: Respondent Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. (SC)21-01365
01/15/2021MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)21-01493
01/15/2021BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)21-01494
02/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief on cross-appeal is granted. The reply brief on cross-appeal was filed on January 15, 2021. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)21-03034
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)
03/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC).21-07456
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC).
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing (Docket No. 80470-COA), Vacating (Docket No. 81174-COA), and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court REVERSED (Docket No. 80470-COA), VACATED (Docket No. 81174-COA), AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. Nos. 80470/81174. (COA)21-17384
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing (Docket No. 80470-COA), Vacating (Docket No. 81174-COA), and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court REVERSED (Docket No. 80470-COA), VACATED (Docket No. 81174-COA), AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)
07/06/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 80470/81174. (COA)21-19343
07/06/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Kirk C. Johnson. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)
08/18/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)21-24161
09/07/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review. Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)Y21-25941
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 80470/81174 (SC)
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. Nos. 80470/81174 (COA)
09/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellants' answer due: 14 days. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)21-27272
10/05/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Answer to Petition for Review. Nos. 80470/81174. (SC)Y21-28613