Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81484-COA
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 78744, 78744-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788126, C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Constitutional Challenge. (TRANSFERRED FROM SUPREME COURT PER 03/15/21 NOTICE) (COA)21-07482
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-12206
05/13/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 1, 2021. (SC)21-13798
06/04/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-15995
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-20994
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)