Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81568-COA
Short Caption:ARGO GRP. VS. HORTONCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81568
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A807145Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." (VACATED PER 8/26/21 ORDER). Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-14971
06/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-16926
06/12/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from James P. Kemp. (COA)
06/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. Respondent shall have 7 days from the filing and service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (COA)21-17349
06/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-18836
07/05/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-19177
08/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Prior Order, Vacating District Court Order and Remanding. "We vacate our prior Order Reversing and Remanding, vacate the district court's order granting the petition for judicial review, and remand this matter to the district court to remand to the appeals officer to apply the recently enacted legislation." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-24905
09/20/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/20/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)