Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82025-COA
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):46938, 48810, 48867, 48878, 64878, 66554, 66554-COA, 79598, 81814, 81814-COA, 82025
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A817402, C207835Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-13978
05/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-15150
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-20992
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)