Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82632
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF THOMAS S. SHADDIXCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/16/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
03/16/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I - III. (SC).21-07590
03/16/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I - III, Cont... (SC).21-07591
03/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-07604
04/19/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
05/14/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. "We hereby suspend attorney Thomas S. Shaddix from the practice of law in Nevada for 6 months and 1 day, stayed for 18 months." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13957
05/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts No. 82632. (SC)21-15120
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16374
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 6, 2021. (SC)21-16374