Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82636
Short Caption:RUPEL VS. GALTENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D555046Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/23/2021 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/17/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
03/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-07724
03/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-07726
03/22/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Barnes Law Group. E-payment Ref. no. 21031734029481. (SC)
03/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due 21 days. (SC).21-08171
03/23/2021Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC)21-08256
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) District Court Minutes. (SC)
03/25/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-08609
03/26/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss/Settlement. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion upon completion of settlement proceedings. (SC)21-08722
03/26/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-08763
03/31/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. (SC)
04/01/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation. (SC).
04/01/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation. The Zoom Settlement Conference in this matter has been continued, by agreement, from March 30, 2021, at 12:30 PM to April 13, 2021, at 12:30 PM. (SC)21-09404
04/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: April 26, 2021. (SC)21-10444
04/13/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 21, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC)21-10704
04/26/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-11951
05/04/2021Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/5/21)(SC)
05/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-12849
05/27/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. The parties to this appeal have been able to agree to settle one or more issues but will be filing a stipulation requesting appeal to be dismissed without prejudice and be remanded to the district court for resolution of remaining issues. (SC)21-15266
06/18/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 30 days. (SC)21-17609
07/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice Status of Appeal. (SC)21-19672
07/13/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-20105
07/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days of appellant's response. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-20434
07/15/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-20486
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, "this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-22168