Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82641
Short Caption:BLANDINO (KIM) VS. SHERIFF (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79191, 79191-COA, 79524, 79524-COA, 80363, 80363-COA, 80541, 80541-COA, 80606, 80606-COA, 81327, 81327-COA, 81431, 81765, 81765-COA, 82034, 82034-COA, 82502, 83259, 83472
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C341767Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Stiglich for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/18/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Mandamus and/or Prohibition and/or Certiorari and to take Judicial Notice and to Suspend Rules Pursuant to NRAP 2. (SC)21-07808
03/18/2021Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Exhibit 1EPM-5EPM. (SC)21-07809
03/18/2021Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Exhibit 6EPM, 1.2EBM-11EBM. (SC)21-07813
03/30/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Mandamus and/or Prohibition and /or Certiorari and to Take Judicial Notice. (SC)21-09108
04/05/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Extraordinary Relief. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [in light of this order, petitioner's emergency motion is denied as moot.] JH/RP/LS. (SC)21-09741
04/20/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Emergency Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-11441
05/14/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/LS. (SC)21-14035
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. (SC)21-16376
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)