Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79424-COA
Short Caption:EVANS-WAIAU VS. TATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79424
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A736457Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-15002
06/14/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SURPREME COURT) (COA)21-16948
06/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' petition for rehearing due: July 14, 2021. (COA)21-17780
07/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-20352
07/14/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Kevin T. Strong. (SC)
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied. " NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-21017
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)