Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81132-COA
Short Caption:RAITER VS. KHOSHCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81132
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A792614Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
06/25/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Withdraw As Counsel of Record. (COA)21-18328
07/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Robert E. Schumacher and Dylan E. Houston of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP. (COA)21-19865
07/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove Michael M. Lin, Francis A. Arenas, and the Lin Law Group from the docket in this appeal and shall replace them with Robert E. Schumacher, Dylan E. Houston, and the law firm of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, as counsel for respondent. (COA)21-20578
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-21050
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)