Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82642
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF SUNEEL J. NELSON.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/23/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/22/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
03/22/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I - II. (SC).21-08117
03/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-08120
04/23/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
06/07/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. "We hereby suspend attorney Suneel J. Nelson from the practice of law in Nevada for one year commencing from the date of this order and to run concurrent with the suspension imposed in Docket No. 81950." En Banc. (SC).21-16192
06/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts No. 82642. (SC)21-17227
07/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19093
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 12, 2021. (SC)21-19093