Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82644
Short Caption:PAMPLIN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):49171, 76093, 76110, 76110-COA, 76111, 76111-COA, 76350, 80289, 80289-COA, 80512, 80512-COA, 83332
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184760Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/22/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/22/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08161
04/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Written Order. District Court's written order due: 60 days. (SC)21-09436
04/05/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on Response to Supreme Court Order dated 04/01/2021 - C184760. (SC)21-09803
04/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)21-10415
04/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (C184760) Vol. 1. (SC)21-10814
04/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (C184760) Vol. 2. (SC)21-10816
04/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (C184760) Vol. 3. (SC)21-10817
04/19/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 1-27, 158-160, and 161-162. (SC)
04/19/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 51-142. (SC)
04/21/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Request to Terminate Motion to Correct an Illegal Sentence. (SC)21-11537
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12329
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15139
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15139