Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82657
Short Caption:VONSEYDEWITZ VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78549, 78549-COA, 82805
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A776695Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08492
03/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-08494
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10100
04/13/2021Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)21-10693
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12579
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 6, 2021. (SC)21-12579