Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82659
Short Caption:CUEVAS VS. RODRIGUEZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D501592Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/02/2021 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08514
03/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-08516
03/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-08518
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Confidential Cover Sheet. (SC)
03/26/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-08721
04/01/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Emily M. McFarling. (SC)
04/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-09440
04/02/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)21-09534
04/12/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-10472
04/15/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 11, 2021, at 9:00 AM via BlueJeans. (SC)21-10968
05/11/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-13570
05/12/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-13628
05/18/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-14312
05/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued.21-14524