Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82660
Short Caption:WHITTLE VS. MORRIS (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D591074Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08529
03/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-08532
03/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Confidential Cover Sheet. (SC)
04/07/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Emily Stevens. Check no. 4475. (SC)
04/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC)21-10045
04/19/2021Docketing StatementFiled Proper person Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-11244
04/19/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/3/19. Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC)21-11246
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC).21-12330
05/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing (Ex Parte Motion to Amend Notice of Appeal for Scriveners' Error; and Reinstate Case). (SC)21-13661
05/14/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due: 7 days. (SC)21-14045
05/18/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Civil Confidential Cover Sheet (Amended NOA). (SEALED). (SC).
05/20/2021Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Brian Whittle cashier's check no. 0650111441. (SC)
05/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-15345
06/16/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Extension to File Answer. (SC)21-17369
06/16/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Amended) (SC)21-17370
06/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answer to the petition for rehearing due: July 12, 2021. (SC)21-17934
07/09/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-19810
07/27/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Decision and Order. Filed in district court on 03/01/2021. (SC)21-21692
07/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Rehearing, Reinstating Appeal, and Directing Transmission of Record. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 60 days. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC)21-21813
08/09/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)21-23081
08/09/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 2. (SC)21-23082
08/12/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 17 to 19, 33 to 39, 50 to 51, 69 to 81, 141 to 151, 221 to 236 and 247 to 254 (SEALED). (SC)
09/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Confirm Fast Track Statement rather than "Informal Brief" is Acceptable and for Authorization for Additional Pages. (SC)21-26458
09/24/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's motion for leave to file a fast track statement instead of an opening brief is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received on September 13, 2021. The clerk shall detach the exhibit from the fast track statement and return it unfiled. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. fn1 [This court takes no action in regard to appellant's request to file a fast track statement in excess of the page limit, as his fast track statement is within the allowable page limit. NRAP 3E(d)(1).] (SC)21-27658
09/24/2021Fast Track BriefFiled Proper Person Fast Track Statement. (EXHIBITS RETURNED UNFILED PER 9/24/21). (SC)21-27659