Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79630-COA
Short Caption:PEELER VS. AIELLOCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79630
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A719054Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing, Vacating, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED, VACATE the order awarding attorney fees and costs, and REMAND this matter for a new trial and further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-22029
08/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reissue July 29, 2021 Order Reversing, Vacating, and Remanding. (COA)Y21-23574
08/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Bill of Costs. (TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPREME COURT)(COA)
08/16/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent shall have until August 30, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. (COA)21-23872
08/30/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time To File Petition For Rehearing. (COA)21-25165
08/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Scott Lundy. (COA)21-25324
09/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's petition for rehearing due: September 29, 2021. (COA)21-26060