Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80167-COA
Short Caption:HARRISON VS. RAMPARTS, INC.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78964, 80167
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A732342Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-21054
08/03/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's motion to reissue order as an opinion due: August 18, 2021. (COA)21-22509
08/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reissue July 21, 2021 Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding as a Published Opinion. (COA)Y21-23981
08/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Scott E. Lundy, Esq., of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm hereby enters his appearance as associated counsel for Appellant). (COA)21-25323