Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80167-COA & 80167
Short Caption:HARRISON VS. RAMPARTS, INC.Court:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78964, 80167
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A732342Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-49634
12/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-49638
12/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Waive Filing Fee and to Combine Appeals. Nos. 78964/80167. (SC).19-51995
12/30/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and to Combine Appeals due: January 14, 2020. (SC).19-52315
01/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Micah S. Echols, Esq. and Claggett & Sykes Law Firm as counsel for Appellant). (SC)20-02858
01/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/23/20). (SC)
01/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal and Firm Disassociation (Thomas W. Stewart). (SC)20-02878
01/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC)20-03155
01/27/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC)20-03735
01/27/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC)20-03736
01/31/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases. (SC)20-04368
02/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal and Regarding Motions. The appeal in Docket No. 78964 is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The appeal in Docket No. 80167 shall proceed. The motion to waive the filing fee in Docket No. 80167 is denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee in Docket No. 80167. fn1[Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the response to the "Motion to Waive Filing Fee and Combine Cases" is granted. The response was filed on January 27, 2020.] NNP20-RP/JH/EC Nos. 78964/80167. (SC)20-06249
02/18/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC)
02/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-06802
02/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John Walter Boyer. (SC)20-06994
03/10/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-09514
03/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-09704
03/11/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-09708
03/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-10456
05/22/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).20-19635
05/29/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: June 12, 2020. (SC)20-20397
06/08/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC).20-21524
06/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 9, 2020. (SC).20-21571
06/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-22114
06/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss due: July 6, 2020. (SC)20-22990
07/06/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC).20-24858
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. (SC).20-25376
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. (SC).20-25377
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. (SC).20-25378
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. (SC).20-25385
07/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. (SC).20-25389
07/09/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC).20-25396
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Granting Extension of Time. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion to dismiss this appeal is denied. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 10, 2020. (SC).20-26121
08/10/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC)20-29413
08/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 24, 2020. (SC)20-30647
08/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC)20-31186
08/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SKRICKEN PER 9/3/20 ORDER). (SC)
09/01/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)20-32291
09/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time filed on August 24, 2020, is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The amended opening brief was filed on September 1, 2020. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on August 31, 2020. Respondent shall have until October 1, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-32550
09/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)20-35919
09/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-35937
11/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-39811
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 2, 2020. (SC).20-40684
12/01/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC)20-43468
12/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 16, 2020. (SC)20-44936
12/16/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Fourth Request). (SC)20-45545
12/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46465
12/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on December 16, 2020, is granted. The answering brief was filed on December 23, 2020. Appellant shall have until January 22, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)20-46619
01/21/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 5, 2021. (SC)21-01815
02/03/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC)21-03335
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 19, 2021. (SC)21-03619
02/19/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). (SC)21-05073
02/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 5, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)21-05211
03/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-06578
03/08/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-08772
03/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-21054
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Gibbons, C.J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
08/03/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's motion to reissue order as an opinion due: August 18, 2021. (COA)21-22509
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER).21-23727
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER).
08/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reissue July 21, 2021 Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding as a Published Opinion. (COA)Y21-23981
08/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur and reinstate this appeal. (SC).21-25211
08/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Scott E. Lundy, Esq., of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm hereby enters his appearance as associated counsel for Appellant). (COA)21-25323
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 08/30/21 ORDER). (SC)21-23727