Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82672
Short Caption:CONTE VS. CONTECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79922, 79922-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D442958Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/29/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
03/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-08857
03/29/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Stay. (SC)21-08860
03/29/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC)21-08862
03/31/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Stay. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/31/21) (SC)
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance for Richard Crane. (SC)21-09377
03/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Richard L. Crane. (SC)21-09379
03/31/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Stay. (SC)21-09380
04/07/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wayne D. Conte. Cashier's Check no. 9630800515. (SC)
04/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-10047
04/19/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/12/21. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC)21-11239
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Appellant's motion for stay is denied as moot.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. (SC)21-11703
05/04/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/12/21. (SC)21-12730
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14412
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2021. (SC)21-14412