Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82676
Short Caption:ANDERSON (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60723, 61371, 62182, 64048, 65290, 65290-COA, 69858, 69858-COA, 80158, 80159, 80463
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A817789, C268406Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/29/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (A817789) (SC)21-08906
04/09/2021Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-10248
04/09/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)21-10249
07/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-21015
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant's counsel has filed a notice of voluntary withdrawal of this appeal. Having been so informed, appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-22135
08/06/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of No Withdraw of Appeal. (SC)21-22889
08/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Appeal. Appellant has now filed a pro se notice in which he states that he did not agree to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. He also requests that this court sanction his counsel and appoint him new counsel. This appeal is reinstated. Appellant's pro se request to sanction his counsel and appoint new counsel is denied. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 120 days. (SC)21-24323
08/27/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document. (SC)21-25067
09/14/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document, Informal Brief, Docketing Statement, and En Banc Rehearing. (SC)21-26515