Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82677
Short Caption:OFELDT (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):46384, 48336, 49679, 55992, 56822, 59811, 68322, 68322-COA, 79799
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032701Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/29/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08933
04/01/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion for Proper Procedure filed in district court on March 8,2021. (SC)21-09410
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10114
04/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing - Appellant's Request for Reconsideration. (SC)21-11965
05/18/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-14238
06/14/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16962
06/14/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 16, 2021. (SC)21-16962