Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82679
Short Caption:GUATEMALA-AQUINO VS. HILLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A796352Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/29/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-08953
03/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-08955
03/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-08957
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-11124
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13509
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13509