Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 82684
Short Caption:CENTOFANTI, III (ALFRED) VS. CLERK OF COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):38987, 43895, 44984, 52994, 58562, 78193, 78193-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172534Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice CadishPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/30/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/30/2021Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. (SC)21-09088
03/30/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-09093
04/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Proof of Service for Petition for Writ. (SC)21-10250
04/29/2021OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
05/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Elissa Cadish, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter. To the extent petitioner complains that Justice Cadish participated in Docket No. 78193, which involved an appeal of her decision as a district court judge, we note Justice Cadish did not participate in the resolution of the petition for review and issuance of the order denying petition for review with her signature was error. The clerk of this court shall file a corrected order in Docket No. 78193 that denies the petition for review and accurately reflects the justices who participated in the decision.] EN BANC (SC)21-14585
06/14/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-16963
06/14/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)