Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82703
Short Caption:JOHNSON VS. HORODESKY (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61340, 67177
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D349743Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/01/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/01/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09415
04/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-09417
04/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
04/12/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Earl A. Johnson. Check no. 5247. (SC)
04/12/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC)21-10552
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-11001
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13511
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13511