Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82707
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF LIBORIUS AGWARACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/10/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/01/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
04/01/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I of II. (SC).21-09457
04/01/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II of II. (SC).21-09458
04/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-09462
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
06/07/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Reinstatement. "We hereby reinstate Liborius I. Agwara to the practice of law in Nevada effective on the date of this order." En Banc. (SC).21-16202
06/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts No. 82707. (SC)21-16527
07/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19094
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 12, 2021. (SC)21-19094