Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 82708
Short Caption:LV DEBT COLLECT, LLC VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A745486Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/20/2021 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09549
04/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-09551
04/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Shumway Van. Check no. 66706. (SC)
04/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-10700
04/20/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)21-11440
05/04/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-12815
05/10/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 8, 2021, at 1:00 PM. (SC)21-13305
06/11/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Dismissal of Appeal Without Prejudice. (SC)21-16874
06/21/2021Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/VoluntarySettlement. Pursuant to appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal, "this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-17790