Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82710
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82617, 82710-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813134Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/03/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
04/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09584
04/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-09587
04/19/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)21-11269
04/19/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC)21-11277
05/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Frank A. Toddre, II, Senior Deputy Attorney General has assumed responsibility for representing the interests of Respondents in place of Katlyn M. Brady, Senior Deputy Attorney General). (SC)21-12589
06/03/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
06/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)21-18841
07/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-19717
07/09/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).