Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82712
Short Caption:QUINONES (ANTHONY) VS. STATE C/W 82713/82714Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:82712*, 82713, 82714Related Case(s):80992
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR191884BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09632
04/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for John Reese Petty. (SC)21-10124
04/09/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/2/21. To Court Reporter: S. Koetting. (SC)21-10230
04/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Remove Appeal from Fast Track Program and to Consolidate Appeals for Full Briefing. Nos. 82712/82713/82714 (SC)21-10237
04/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Entry of Amended Judgment of Conviction. The district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order (1) reinstate the original judgment of conviction in district court case number CR19-1092 or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. fn1[This court defers ruling on appellant's motions to consolidate these appeals, removal of Docket No. 82714 from the criminal fast track program, and for full briefing.] Nos. 82712/82713/82714. (SC)21-11400
05/04/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court: Order Reinstating Judgement of Conviction. (SC)21-12738
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate and Regarding Briefing. Appellant has filed motions to consolidate these appeals. The motions are granted. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant also moves to remove the appeal in Docket No. 82714 from this court's criminal fast track program and for full briefing. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove the appeal in Docket No. 82714 from the criminal fast track program. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single docketing statement. Appellant shall have 120 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix in these consolidated appeals. fn1 [Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement and appendix in Docket No. 82714 is denied as moot.] Nos. 82712/82713/82714. (SC)21-13737
05/21/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. Nos. 82712/82713/82714 (SC)21-14656
07/07/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Consolidated Appeal. Nos. 82712/82713/82714 (SC)21-19402
07/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDERS these appeals DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos. 82712/82713/82714. (SC)21-20289