Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82717
Short Caption:DANINO VS. ARIA RESORT AND CASINO HOLDINGS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A810004Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09663
04/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-09665
04/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Respondent, Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC (Craig S. Newman and Anthony R. Ager of the law firm of Sklar Williams PLLC are hereby appearing as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-10220
04/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Notice of Appearance). (SC)21-10226
04/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-11357
04/27/2021Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 510942 returned to Avraham Danino. (SC)
05/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 6/11/21 ORDER). (SC).21-14137
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 6/11/21 ORDER). (SC).
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Revocation of an Order Dismissing the Appeal. (SC)21-15005
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 18, 2021. (SC)21-14137
06/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion, Reinstating Appeal, Recalling Remittitur, and Directing Payment of Filing Fee. Appellant has now filed a motion asking this court to revoke the order dismissing this appeal. The motion is construed as a motion for reconsideration of the clerk's order dismissing this appeal. The unopposed motion for reconsideration is granted and this appeal is reinstated. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to pay the $250 filing fee. (SC)21-16848
06/22/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Mizarahi Tefahot Bank. Check no. 510948. (SC)
06/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-18059
07/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." JH/RP/LS (SC)21-19058
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21657
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21657
08/13/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Request for Revocation of an Order Dismissing the Appeal Filed on July 2, 2021. (SC)21-23683