Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82728
Short Caption:FORD (DAMIEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75105, 81342, 81342-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C312414Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/07/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-09987
04/19/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC)
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-11734
07/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19586
07/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 9, 2021. (SC)21-19586