Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82733
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF MICHAEL R. PANDULLOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/13/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
04/08/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I. (SC).21-10079
04/08/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II. (SC).21-10080
04/08/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II. Cont... (SC).21-10081
04/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-10083
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
07/21/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Denying Reinstatement. "We therefore disapprove the panel's recommendation and deny Pandullo's petition for reinstatement." Pickering, J., dissenting. En Banc. (SC).21-20963
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23838
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on August 24, 2021. (SC)21-23838