Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82735
Short Caption:SN TEAM, LLC VS. US BANK NAT'L ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A796101Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/14/2021 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10087
04/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-10089
04/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Avalon Legal Group. Check no. 1035. (SC)
04/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-10712
04/14/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)21-10824
04/26/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 10, 2021, at 2:00 PM. (SC)21-11949
05/05/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: May 18, 2021. (SC)21-12852
05/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement process is continued to the following date: May 24, 2021, at 2:00 PM. (SC)21-13681
05/18/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-14288
05/21/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-14715
05/25/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-14870
06/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-15695
07/02/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-19106
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. This court "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-20136
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23035
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 9, 2021. (SC)21-23035