Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82739
Short Caption:KURTZE (GIOVANNI) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73490, 73536, 73537, 73597, 73598, 73599, 73680, 73742, 73830, 73973, 73974, 74039, 74189, 74252, 74597, 74675, 77304, 79257, 79258, 79258-COA, 79259, 79260, 79261, 79348, 79601, 81105, 81130, 82606, 83084
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A791112
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C299786
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (A791112) (SC)21-10112
04/14/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (C299786) (SC)21-10812
04/14/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (A791112) (Second NOA) (SC)21-10813
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12496
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15117
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15117