Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82743
Short Caption:BURTON VS. ASCENCIONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82138
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A767958Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10153
04/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-10155
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. "This appeal is dismissed". (SC)21-12137
04/28/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Randal R. Leonard. (REFUNDED PER ORDER FILED 5/6/21.) (SC)
04/28/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Vacate Dismissal. (SC)21-12188
05/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Because appellant had not yet paid the filing fee, on April 28, 2021, this court dismissed this appeal by way of a clerk's order. Later that same day, appellant submitted the filing fee and filed a motion to vacate the dismissal of this appeal. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall refund the $250 filing fee received on April 28, 2021. (SC)21-12989
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15036
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15036