Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82749
Short Caption:JAHED VS. ABRAHAMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581618Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Suspended
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/09/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10294
04/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-10296
04/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC).
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. "This appeal is dismissed". (SC)21-12138
05/11/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Filing Fee. (SC)21-13542
05/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Appeal. On April 28, 2021, this pro se appeal was dismissed by way of a clerk's order for failure to pay the filing fee. On May 11, 2021, appellant filed a letter informing this court that it was her intent to pay the filing fee within the time prescribed by this court and asking how she can proceed with this appeal. The letter is construed as a motion for reconsideration of the clerk's order dismissing this appeal. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall deposit the cashier's check that was filed on May 26, 2021, and issue a notice regarding the deadlines that govern the briefing of this appeal. (SC).21-15349
05/28/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nahid Jahed. Cashiers Check No. 9536721639. (SC).
05/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-15355
06/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)21-16419
06/15/2021Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Transcripts. (SC)21-17233
06/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellant's Request for Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-17236
06/21/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 2, 2021. (SC)21-17726
06/22/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-7 (Via FTP). (SC)21-17998
06/28/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 25 to 35, 51 to 64, 324 to 334, 612 to 619, 819 to 829, 917 to 927, 928 to 937, 1118 to 1125 and 1168 to 1178 (SEALED). (SC)
07/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Referring For Pro Bono Counsel. This court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. The clerk of this court is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of appearance due: 60 days. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-19390
07/08/2021Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)21-19583
09/03/2021MotionFiled Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation and Request for Extension of Time (Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc.). (SC)21-25777
09/03/2021MotionFiled Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation and Request for Extension of Time (Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc.). (SC)21-25784
09/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The Legal Aid Center shall have until October 5, 2021, to locate a pro bono attorney and cause that attorney to enter a notice of appearance in this court. If a volunteer attorney cannot be located, the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada shall notify this court in writing, within the same time period. Briefing remains suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-26007