Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81812-COA
Short Caption:SAIZ, JR. (BILLY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81812
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A818017, C336703Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Respondent's response due: 30 days. The response shall comply with the provisions in NRAP 28 and NRAP 32. (COA)21-15135
06/24/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Taleen Pandukht. (COA)21-18235
06/24/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 6/24/21) (COA)
06/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA)21-18247
06/24/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Claim. (COA)21-18266
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court to properly serve Saiz with an order giving Saiz a reasonable time in which to fix the procedural defects in his petition." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-20110
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)