Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82026-COA
Short Caption:LOVE (WILSON) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):42309, 42757, 67999, 82026
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C136024Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice, False Imprisonment. (COA)21-12474
06/09/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Illegal Prosecution. (COA)21-16581
06/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [We have reviewed all documents Love has filed in this matter, and we conclude no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-17478
06/28/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Agree and Object. (TO BE CONSTRUED AS A PETITION FOR REHEARING PER ORDER FILED 7/9/21). (COA)21-18580
07/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a pro se "Motion to Agree and Object." It appears appellant requests rehearing of this court's Order of Affirmance, entered on June 17, 2021. Accordingly, the clerk shall treat appellant's June 28, 2021, motion as a petition for rehearing. (COA)21-19702
08/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-24209
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)