Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82754
Short Caption:LOWEY VS. LOWEY (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D600111Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/12/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/12/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10454
04/12/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-10465
04/12/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-10467
04/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC)21-10544
04/15/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SEALED) Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC)
05/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Directing Payment of the Filing Fee. The clerk of this court shall remove Jerome R. Bowen, Theodore M. Medlyn, and Bowen Law Offices as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter an appearance or to inform his court in writing that he intends to proceed pro se. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee or demonstrate compliance with Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure 24. (SC)21-12980
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's order. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-17343
07/12/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19986
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2021. (SC)21-19986