Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82757
Short Caption:FERGASON (BRYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52788, 52877, 53848, 57538, 58625, 59264, 59871, 59900, 59910, 64165, 64255, 65827, 66986, 71222, 71222-COA, 72944, 72944-COA, 73388, 73388-COA, 74469, 78299, 78312, 81048, 81852, 83331
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A827365, C228752Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (A827365) (SC)21-10598
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12497
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15118
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15118