Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82761
Short Caption:WARD (KEITH) VS. STATE, DEP'T OF CORR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20EW000441BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10629
04/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney for Respondent (Trisha Chapman, Deputy Attorney General instead and in place of Rachael Chesterfield, Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-10819
04/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. The attorney general shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the notice of appeal log maintained at the prison indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered to a prison official his notice of appeal. (SC)21-12048
05/24/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Compliance with Court's Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. (SC)21-14838
05/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-15042
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17778
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 23, 2021. (SC)21-17778