Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82766
Short Caption:RICE (CURTIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR202515Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/14/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-10763
04/22/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)21-11640
05/03/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Marie Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/11/21. (SC)21-12671
05/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-13254
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Having been so informed, appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13900