Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82776
Short Caption:LANDAN VS. LANDANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60788, 76089, 77858, 77858-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D422653Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/15/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-10906
04/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-10908
04/19/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC)
04/22/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Extension of Time for Filing Fee. (SC)21-11673
04/23/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Payment Processing Center C/O Charles D. Landan Check No. 0098203520 . (SC) (STOP PAYMENT PUT ON CHECK, CHECK RETURNED 05/04/21)
04/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-11920
04/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion as Moot. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to pay the filing fee is denied as moot because the filing fee was paid on April 23, 2021. (SC)21-11923
05/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Charles Landan re: check returned for stop payment. Requesting payment of filing fee within 10 days. (SC)21-12765
05/06/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-13055
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Cause appearing, appellant's pro se motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-13522