Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82791
Short Caption:ENCORE AUDIO VISUAL DESIGN, LLC VS. STATE, DEP'T OF TAXATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1900186Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/20/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-11395
04/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-11398
05/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-14355
06/03/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (CONSTRUED AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE CLERK'S ORDER DISMISSING THIS APPEAL PER ORDER FILED 7/8/21). (SC)21-15972
06/03/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jerry M. Snyder. (REFUNDED PER ORDER 7/8/21). (SC)
06/08/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled State Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/09/21). (SC)
06/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. State Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-16472
07/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 19, 2021, this appeal was dismissed by way of a Clerk's Order for failure to pay the filing fee. On June 3, 2021, appellant filed a petition for rehearing. The petition for rehearing is construed as a motion for reconsideration of the clerk's order dismissing this appeal. The clerk of this court shall refund the rehearing fee paid by appellant on June 3, 2021. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any opposition to the motion for reconsideration. (SC)21-19524
07/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (David J. Pope, Chief Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondents). (SC)21-20301
07/15/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to the motion for reconsideration due: July 29, 2021. (SC)21-20385
07/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled State Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's (Appellant's) Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-22047
08/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On May 19, 2021, the court dismissed this appeal by way of a clerk's order for appellant's failure to pay the filing fee. Appellant has moved for reconsideration of that order and respondent opposes the motion. See NRAP 27(c)(3)(A). The motion for reconsideration is denied. (SC)21-23468
09/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-26108
09/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/16/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2021. (SC)21-26108