Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82799
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82313
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A797264Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/21/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
04/21/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-11546
04/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-11548
04/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Frank A. Toddre II, Senior Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondents in place of Katlyn M. Brady, Senior Deputy Attorney General). (SC)21-12145
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12498
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15119
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15119